TN HB1954 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for illegally transferring a firearm to a minor from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class D felony and requires that an adult who is convicted be punished as criminally responsible for any resulting crime; creates the Class D felony of inducing or coercing a minor to commit theft of a firearm or robbery or burglary involving theft of a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to firearms offenses involving minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2871 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee