TN HB1939 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits certain individuals from being considered ineligible to receive payment for providing TennCare medicaid-reimbursed home- and community-based long-term care services to an individual eligible to receive such services on the basis that the individual providing care and the individual receiving care reside in the same home. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to payment for healthcare services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Effective date(s) 03/27/2024 | |
2024-04-03 | Pub. Ch. 621 | |
2024-03-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-03-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-03-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0570) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 2, PNV 5 |
2024-03-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0574) |
2024-02-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action def. in Insurance Committee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2036 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621