TN HB1938 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 887
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 887
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits continued property tax exemption for property financed by certain federal programs, when the loan has been paid in full and the property continues to be used for elderly persons or persons with disabilities; revises the provisions regarding projects with 12 units. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, permits continued property tax exemption for property financed by certain federal programs, when the loan has been paid in full and the property continues to be used for elderly persons or persons with disabilities; revises the provisions regarding projects with 12 units. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 887 |
2014-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Finance |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2283 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 887