TN HB1938 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases penalty for Class A misdemeanor offense of unlawful sale of air conditioner evaporator coil or condenser to a Class C fine only misdemeanor if the defendant is certified to repair and install HVAC equipment. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, decreases penalty for Class A misdemeanor offense of unlawful sale of air conditioner evaporator coil or condenser to a Class C fine only misdemeanor if the defendant is certified to repair and install HVAC equipment. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-02 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2075 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-28 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1938&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1938.pdf |