TN HB1921 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts feminine hygiene products from sales tax on the annual sales tax holiday. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, exempts feminine hygiene products from sales tax on the annual sales tax holiday. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1724 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-18 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation