TN HB1920 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the county election commission to designate restroom facilities in each building in which the election is held that are for the use of workers or volunteers working for a campaign; prohibits county election commissions from prohibiting workers or volunteers from using the designated restroom facilities if the worker or volunteer covers or removes clothing and accoutrements bearing campaign material. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, requires the county election commission to designate restroom facilities in each building in which the election is held that are for the use of workers or volunteers working for a campaign; prohibits county election commissions from prohibiting workers or volunteers from using the designated restroom facilities if the worker or volunteer covers or removes clothing and accoutrements bearing campaign material. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2709 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee