TN HB1890 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-23 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a program to allow the department of agriculture to acquire and administer real estate interests in the state, including the administration of grants for the purpose of preserving farm and forestry land; creates the Farmland Preservation Fund to be used for the program; specifies provisions that must be included in an agricultural easement acquired through the program. - Amends TCA Title 43, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 43, Chapter 1, Part 1, relative to agricultural real estate interests.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee - Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2099 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee