TN HB1877 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 504
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides for revocation of driver license for nonpayment of litigation taxes, court costs or fines in certain circumstances; provides payment plan option and hardship exemption. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 40, Chapter 24, Part 1; Title 50 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, provides for revocation of driver license for nonpayment of litigation taxes, court costs or fines in certain circumstances; provides payment plan option and hardship exemption. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 40, Chapter 24, Part 1; Title 50 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gotto [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Pub. Ch. 504 | |
2011-06-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-20 | Passed S., Ayes 20, Nays 11 | |
2011-05-20 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-05-19 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-05-19 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-05-19 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 6, PNV 1 | |
2011-05-19 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA0516) | |
2011-05-19 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0498) | |
2011-05-19 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0131) | |
2011-05-18 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/11/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-03-29 | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/22/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1798 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 504