TN HB1857 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 838
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 838
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires any person operating in this state as a pharmacy benefits manager to be licensed by the department of commerce and insurance prior to operating. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 6, Part 4 and Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 31.
Title
As enacted, requires any person operating in this state as a pharmacy benefits manager to be licensed by the department of commerce and insurance prior to operating. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 6, Part 4 and Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 31.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 838 | |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to Next Calendar |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1852 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 838