TN HB1854 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 837
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 837
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires jury coordinator to prepare and send a list of persons disqualified or potentially disqualified from jury service due to certain reasons to the administrator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 22, Chapter 1 and Title 22, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, requires jury coordinator to prepare and send a list of persons disqualified or potentially disqualified from jury service due to certain reasons to the administrator of elections. - Amends TCA Title 22, Chapter 1 and Title 22, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 837 | |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1808 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 837