TN HB1840 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "closeout" for purposes of the Unfair Wine Sales Law. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, defines "closeout" for purposes of the Unfair Wine Sales Law. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2495 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee