TN HB1839 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates one additional circuit court each in the thirteenth, nineteenth, twenty-second, and twenty-third judicial districts; creates one additional chancery court in the nineteenth judicial district. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16, Chapter 2, relative to judicial districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2807 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee