TN HB1838 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 987
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 987
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, divides the appointing authority for each of the nine members of the board representing the state's nine congressional districts among the governor, the speaker of the senate, and the speaker of the house of representatives such that each appoints three members; revises the legislative confirmation process for members appointed on or after July 1, 2022; revises other appointment and confirmation related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1, relative to the state board of education.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 70 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - HOUSE EDUCATION ADMINISTRATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - K-12 SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 987 | |
2022-05-05 | Effective date(s) 7/01/2022 | |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-11 | House | Reenrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-08 | Governor failed to return. | |
2022-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 70, Nays 15 PNV 0 HB1838 |
2022-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/24/22 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 1 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0615) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 68, Nays 18, PNV 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/17/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/1/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1838 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 987