TN HB1834 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires governmental entities and private employers with six or more employees to verify new hires using the E-Verify program. - Amends TCA Section 12-3-309 and Title 50, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, requires governmental entities and private employers with six or more employees to verify new hires using the E-Verify program. - Amends TCA Section 12-3-309 and Title 50, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Carr [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2026 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-29 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1834&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1834.pdf |