TN HB1832 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1098
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes an advisory task force to recommend a proposed statewide judicial redistricting plan. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 18, relative to judicial districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1098 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2011 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2022