TN HB1821 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes requirement that state-operated medical laboratories and public health laboratory personnel who work at medical laboratories operated by the state be regulated under the Tennessee Medical Laboratory Act. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-5001; Section 68-1-901; Title 68, Chapter 12; Title 68, Chapter 29; Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 32.
Title
As enacted, removes requirement that state-operated medical laboratories and public health laboratory personnel who work at medical laboratories operated by the state be regulated under the Tennessee Medical Laboratory Act. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-5001; Section 68-1-901; Title 68, Chapter 12; Title 68, Chapter 29; Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 788 | |
2018-04-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2245 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 788