TN HB1816 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends 120-day period certain pregnant insureds may continue to receive covered benefits after termination of an agreement between a healthcare provider and a managed health insurance issuer to additional classes of insureds. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, extends 120-day period certain pregnant insureds may continue to receive covered benefits after termination of an agreement between a healthcare provider and a managed health insurance issuer to additional classes of insureds. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0796) |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1787 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee