TN HB1808 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, require the department to file a petition of termination of adoptive parent's parental rights with a juvenile court, within 90 days of the juvenile courts finding that there has been substantial noncompliance by a parent or guardian with the statement of responsibilities in a permanency plan. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to the termination of parental rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 652 | |
2024-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2660 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024