TN HB1769 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the orientation training program of the University of Tennessee board of trustees is required for appointed members of the board, not the ex officio members. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the orientation training program of the University of Tennessee board of trustees is required for appointed members of the board, not the ex officio members. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1627 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee