TN HB1769 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Failed in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Failed in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the Tennessee wildlife resources agency to make payments in lieu of taxes to local governments on real property the agency has purchased or otherwise acquired. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 48 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the Tennessee wildlife resources agency to make payments in lieu of taxes to local governments on real property the agency has purchased or otherwise acquired. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 48 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Failed in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Failed in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-Finance |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1743 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-30 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.