TN HB1751 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 994
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 994
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the fees the commissioner may charge for the movement of houseboats that exceed the maximum allowable width for motor vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 7, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, changes the fees the commissioner may charge for the movement of houseboats that exceed the maximum allowable width for motor vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 7, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 994 | |
2018-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1742 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 994