TN HB1731 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1033
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1033
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, imposes licensure and other requirements on pain management clinics. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, imposes licensure and other requirements on pain management clinics. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1033 | |
2016-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Government Operations for review |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1466 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1033
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1731&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1731.pdf |