TN HB1730 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that for purposes of postponement of trial in forcible entry and detainer proceedings, the term "civil court" includes diversionary courts created for special civil proceedings. - Amends TCA Section 29-18-118.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 29-18-118, relative to eviction proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 869 | |
2022-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2002 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2002