TN HB1727 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, decreases the number of signatures required to establish a recognized minor party solely in one county and for certain special elections; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 2-13-107(f); Title 2, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Section 2-13-107(a).
Title
As enacted, decreases the number of signatures required to establish a recognized minor party solely in one county and for certain special elections; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 2-13-107(f); Title 2, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Section 2-13-107(a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 734 |
2014-04-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Reset on Reg cal. for 4/07/14 |
2014-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Action Def. in Local Government Committee to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/12/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1466 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 734