TN HB1727 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Failed In: State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Failed In: State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows student attending a state university to use student identification card as evidence of identification. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, allows student attending a state university to use student identification card as evidence of identification. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Failed In: State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/8/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1381 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.