TN HB1719 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the authority of a magistrate to issue a temporary order of protection to the victim upon the arrest of a person for a domestic violence offense and replaces it with the requirement that, upon a finding that the arrested person is a safety threat to the alleged victim, the magistrate impose conditions of bail designed to protect the alleged victim. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 1 and Section 40-32-101.
Title
As enacted, removes the authority of a magistrate to issue a temporary order of protection to the victim upon the arrest of a person for a domestic violence offense and replaces it with the requirement that, upon a finding that the arrested person is a safety threat to the alleged victim, the magistrate impose conditions of bail designed to protect the alleged victim. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 1 and Section 40-32-101.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 586 | |
2018-03-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-03-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1735 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 586