TN HB1707 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-29 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the department of transportation to develop an electronic procedure to store outstanding certificates of title in lieu of paper documents when possible. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the department of transportation to develop an electronic procedure to store outstanding certificates of title in lieu of paper documents when possible. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1855 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-17 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1707&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1707.pdf |