TN HB1706 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, classifies a money transmission originating in this state to a location outside of the United States or its territories as a service transaction subject to the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 45, Chapter 7; Title 49 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, classifies a money transmission originating in this state to a location outside of the United States or its territories as a service transaction subject to the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 45, Chapter 7; Title 49 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - HOUSE BANKING & INVESTMENTS SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee of Commerce Committee (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Failed in s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Investments Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Investments Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2075 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee