TN HB1678 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates The Register in Davidson County as a club for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As enacted, designates The Register in Davidson County as a club for purposes of consuming alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 677 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass if am; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1638 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 677