TN HB1676 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the board to reject or make technical nonsubstantive revisions to, instead of only adopt, the standards recommended to the board for adoption by the standards recommendation committees. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3, relative to academic standards.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Effective date(s) 03/16/2022 | |
2022-03-23 | Pub. Ch. 660 | |
2022-03-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 5 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0495) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 78, Nays 16, PNV 0 |
2022-02-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0506) |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/14/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/10/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 1/25/2022 |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1775 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 660