TN HB1670 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, replaces the phrase "deaf and dumb" with "deaf or hard of hearing" wherever it may appear in Tennessee Code Annotated. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 23.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 66, Chapter 23, relative to disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 642 | |
2022-02-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/17/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/1/2022 |
2022-01-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1752 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2022