TN HB1663 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 577
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds Tennessee residency as a requirement for participation in the crime victim address confidentiality program; creates a cancellation exception for a program participant if the secretary of state determines the participant is residing at a shelter; decreases from 60 days to 20 days the period of time a program participant must be found to be unreachable prior to the cancellation of a program participant's certification; makes other revisions to the program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 38, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, adds Tennessee residency as a requirement for participation in the crime victim address confidentiality program; creates a cancellation exception for a program participant if the secretary of state determines the participant is residing at a shelter; decreases from 60 days to 20 days the period of time a program participant must be found to be unreachable prior to the cancellation of a program participant's certification; makes other revisions to the program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 38, Part 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 577 | |
2020-03-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 2/12/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1980 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 577