TN HB1662 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 928
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 928
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces by one year the entity review period of the human rights commission by changing the entity termination date from June 30, 2021 to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, reduces by one year the entity review period of the human rights commission by changing the entity termination date from June 30, 2021 to June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21 and Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 928 | |
2018-04-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1567 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 928