TN HB1658 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Class E felony offense of assault against a participant in judicial proceedings, which occurs when a person, while on the premises of a building in which judicial proceedings occur, knowingly assaults a victim that the person knows or reasonably should know is present due to the victim's participation in judicial proceedings. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2221 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-29 - Enrolled and ready for signatures