TN HB1652 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a business that allows someone to sign up for a service or subscription online to provide the option to cancel the service or subscription online without additional steps; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to subscription services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2023 | |
2022-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 803 | |
2022-04-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-18 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0564) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0512) |
2022-02-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/17/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 1/26/2022 |
2022-01-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2279 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 803