TN HB1640 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that tort actions brought against a nursing home, home for the aged or assisted-living facility based upon the provision of health care services is a medical malpractice action and is governed by the provisions of Title 29, Chapter 26. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 26; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
As introduced, provides that tort actions brought against a nursing home, home for the aged or assisted-living facility based upon the provision of health care services is a medical malpractice action and is governed by the provisions of Title 29, Chapter 26. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 26; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0101 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1640&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1640.pdf |