TN HB1640 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-25 - Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-25 - Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, in counties using computerized duplicate registration records, permits a person to whom an absentee ballot has been issued to vote a provisional ballot if the voter is in the state on election day except the provisional ballot will only be counted if the absentee ballot was not received by the election commission. - Amends TCA Section 2-6-301.
Title
As introduced, in counties using computerized duplicate registration records, permits a person to whom an absentee ballot has been issued to vote a provisional ballot if the voter is in the state on election day except the provisional ballot will only be counted if the absentee ballot was not received by the election commission. - Amends TCA Section 2-6-301.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1842 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1640&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1640.pdf |