TN HB1631 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 499
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, makes various changes to home school requirements. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3050.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, makes various changes to home school requirements. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3050.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-21 Pub. Ch. 499
2011-06-21 Effective date(s) 07/01/11
2011-06-16 Signed by Governor.
2011-06-06 Transmitted to Governor for his action.
2011-05-25 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-05-24 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-05-24 Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2011-05-19 Passed S., Ayes 25, Nays 7
2011-05-19 S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2011-05-16 Rcvd. from H., P1C.
2011-05-12 Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2011-05-12 Passed H., as am., Ayes 78, Nays 13
2011-05-12 H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0393)
2011-05-05 H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/12/2011
2011-05-04 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/5/2011
2011-05-03 Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2011-04-27 Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/3/2011
2011-04-27 Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
2011-04-20 Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/27/2011
2011-04-20 Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 4/27/2011
2011-04-13 Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 4/20/2011
2011-04-12 Re-referred To: Education Subcommittee
2011-04-06 Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/12/2011
2011-04-05 Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/12/2011
2011-03-30 Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/5/2011
2011-02-24 P2C, ref. to Education Committee
2011-02-23 P1C.
2011-02-17 Intro.
2011-02-17 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1468 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback