TN HB1611 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/19/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/19/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from sales tax any over-the-counter drug for human use dispensed without a prescription. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, exempts from sales tax any over-the-counter drug for human use dispensed without a prescription. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1383 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-19 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1611&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1611.pdf |