TN HB1610 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the commissioner of health to study issues related to healthcare access and healthcare status of populations affected by the implementation of the Addiction Treatment Act of 2015, Chapter 396 of the Public Acts of 2015; the commissioner shall report the findings and any recommendations arising out of the study to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate on or before January 15, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, directs the commissioner of health to study issues related to healthcare access and healthcare status of populations affected by the implementation of the Addiction Treatment Act of 2015, Chapter 396 of the Public Acts of 2015; the commissioner shall report the findings and any recommendations arising out of the study to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate on or before January 15, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2222 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee