TN HB1607 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Pub. Ch. 604
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Pub. Ch. 604
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the state board for licensing contractors, June 30, 2020; revises provisions governing appointments to the board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the state board for licensing contractors, June 30, 2020; revises provisions governing appointments to the board. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 62, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 82 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 604 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Effective date(s) 04/04/2014 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 82, Nays 12 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | S. adopted am. 1 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-02-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0 |
2014-02-20 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/18/2014 |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1555 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 604