TN HB1603 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 508
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes municipalities having a population of at least 100,000 and certain other municipalities to establish an ordinance and permitting process that would enable restaurants to allow admittance of patron pet dogs into designated outdoor dining areas. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 18 and Title 6, Chapter 54.
Title
As enacted, authorizes municipalities having a population of at least 100,000 and certain other municipalities to establish an ordinance and permitting process that would enable restaurants to allow admittance of patron pet dogs into designated outdoor dining areas. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 18 and Title 6, Chapter 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 508 | |
2009-06-11 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on Regular Calendar#2 for 6/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-06-09 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar | |
2009-06-03 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to next calendar | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-19 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to last calendar | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to s/c Public Health and Family Assistance of HHR | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0605 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 508
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1603&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1603.pdf |