TN HB1587 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the retail sale of marijuana; levies a 12 percent tax on the retail sale of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to marijuana.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-03-01HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-25HouseP1C.
2021-02-24HouseIntro.
2021-02-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1477 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback