TN HB1584 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Subject to local approval, rewrites the charter for the Town of Alamo. - Amends Chapter 557 of the Private Acts of 1911; as amended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subject to local approval, rewrites the charter for the Town of Alamo. - Amends Chapter 557 of the Private Acts of 1911; as amended.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
2018-02-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/14/2018
2018-01-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
2018-01-22HouseAssigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
2018-01-22HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-17HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1715 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback