TN HB1541 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 771
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 771
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, broadens the scope of the Used Oil Collection Act of 1993 to address the proper disposal of used antifreeze, transmission fluid, and power steering fluid. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-133 and Title 68, Chapter 211, Part 10.
Title
As enacted, broadens the scope of the Used Oil Collection Act of 1993 to address the proper disposal of used antifreeze, transmission fluid, and power steering fluid. - Amends TCA Section 55-4-133 and Title 68, Chapter 211, Part 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 771 | |
2016-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2544 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 771