TN HB1522 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Small Business Investment Company Credit Act regarding TNInvestco. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 46; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 61; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 42; Title 43; Title 44; Title 45; Title 46; Title 47; Title 48; Title 50; Title 53; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 61; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to commerce.
Sponsors
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 510 | |
2021-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-14 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1552 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021