TN HB1522 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Action def. to TACIR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Action def. to TACIR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires all trailers to be registered, whether for personal or commercial use; levies registration fee based on number of wheel axles; redefines "trailer" to include pole trailers and semitrailers; makes various revisions consistent with mandatory registration of trailers. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 8, Part 1; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires all trailers to be registered, whether for personal or commercial use; levies registration fee based on number of wheel axles; redefines "trailer" to include pole trailers and semitrailers; makes various revisions consistent with mandatory registration of trailers. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 8, Part 1; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Action def. to TACIR |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee--Gvoernment Operations for review |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1634 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1522&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1522.pdf |