TN HB1521 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 603
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 603
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises functions of the office of legal services including duties pertaining to the code commission and duties of the revisor of statutes within the office of legal services. - Amends TCA Section 1-1-101; Section 1-1-102 and Section 3-12-109.
Title
As enacted, revises functions of the office of legal services including duties pertaining to the code commission and duties of the revisor of statutes within the office of legal services. - Amends TCA Section 1-1-101; Section 1-1-102 and Section 3-12-109.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 603 | |
2016-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-02-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2016 |
2016-02-29 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2016-02-25 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-14 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Government Operations for review |
2016-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1622 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-31 - Pub. Ch. 603
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1521&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1521.pdf |