TN HB1493 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows use of school buses for 20 years under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-2109.
Title
As introduced, allows use of school buses for 20 years under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-2109.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Action Def. in s/c K-12 of ED to 3/11/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0992 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1493&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1493.pdf |