TN HB1480 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an exception to the offense of carrying a firearm in public without a handgun carry permit that the person carrying or possessing a firearm or ammunition in a motor vehicle is not otherwise prohibited from carrying a firearm and is in lawful possession of the motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, creates an exception to the offense of carrying a firearm in public without a handgun carry permit that the person carrying or possessing a firearm or ammunition in a motor vehicle is not otherwise prohibited from carrying a firearm and is in lawful possession of the motor vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 870 |
2014-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-16 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1774 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 870